This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 20:45:13 (UTC).

Hoff vs Winnebago Industires

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 Hoff filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Winnebago Industires. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hoff, Teresa

Defendant

Winnebago Industries Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUBEN, DAVID N

Defendant Attorney

MURPHY, THOMAS M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/22/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement (Completion Date March 30, 2021) filed by Hoff, Teresa on 12/18/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketDemand (for Jury Trial) filed by Winnebago Industries Inc on 08/07/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Winnebago Industries Inc on 08/07/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Lisa Darrell, CT Corp, Authorized) filed by Hoff, Teresa on 07/31/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/22/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hoff, Teresa on 06/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hoff, Teresa on 06/15/2020. Filed By: Hoff, Teresa(Plaintiff) Refers To: Winnebago Industries Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WINNEBAGO INDUSTRIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURPHY THOMAS MATTHEW