This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/08/2018 at 23:17:30 (UTC).

Hillford Moving & Storage, Inc. vs. R&F Rolapp Enterprises, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/23/2008 Hillford Moving Storage, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against R F Rolapp Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hillford Moving & Storage, Inc.

Defendant

R&F Rolapp Enterprises, Inc.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2008
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2014
  • Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2013
  • Case reassigned to 44 effective 01/20/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2008
  • Writ issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2008
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Hillford Moving & Storage, Inc. on 04/23/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2008
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Ventura generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2008
  • Judgment for Hillford Moving & Storage, Inc. against R&F Rolapp Enterprises, Inc. in the amount of: 4876.35 principal, 60.00 costs, pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees entered on 02/26/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2008
  • Case disposed with disposition of Judgment contested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2008
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 02/26/2008 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2008
  • The Court finds judgment for Hillford Moving & Storage, Inc. against R&F Rolapp Enterprises, Inc. in the amount of $4876.35 principal, $60.00 costs - After Hearing - Judgment contested on 02/26/08. Other info:none.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2008
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (Cost $10.00 signature illegible) filed by Hillford Moving & Storage, Inc. on 02/04/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • Certified mail sent to Agent Frank Rolapp for R & F Rolapp Enterprises, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 02/26/2008 at 08:15:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Hillford Moving & Storage, Inc. on 01/23/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Hillford Moving & Storage, Inc. on 01/23/2008. Filed By: Hillford Moving & Storage, Inc.(Plaintiff) Refers To: R&F Rolapp Enterprises, Inc.(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES INC. A CORPORATION DBA BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE COMPANY is a litigant