This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 11:39:47 (UTC).

Hernandez vs City of Moorpark

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 Hernandez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Moorpark. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hernandez, Joaquin Chavez

Defendants

Anderson, Gerald

Anderson, Joan

City of Moorpark

Amouzadeh, Jamaldin

Jamaldin, Amouzadeh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Quirk, Logan

Defendant Attorneys

Barresi, Jason A.

SHYER, LISA N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Description: Order to Show Cause RE: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Amend (First Amended Complaint /Leave to Amend) filed by Hernandez, Joaquin Chavez on 11/04/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order submitted by Hernandez, Joaquin Chavez rejected on 11/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (for Leave to File First Amended Complaint; Routed to CR21) submitted by Hernandez, Joaquin Chavez rejected on 10/25/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketMandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - Order to Show Cause RE: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • DocketJamaldin, Amouzadeh added as a Defendant effective 10/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • DocketAmouzadeh, Jamaldin added as a Defendant effective 10/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Doe 2 - Amouzadeh Jamaldin) filed by Hernandez, Joaquin Chavez on 09/27/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Doe 1 - Jamaldin Amouzadeh) filed by Hernandez, Joaquin Chavez on 09/27/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by City of Moorpark on 06/24/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSHYER, LISA N added as a effective 06/24/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial (and Notice of Posting Jury Fees Pursuant to CCP 631) filed by Anderson, Gerald; Anderson, Joan on 06/23/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Anderson, Gerald; Anderson, Joan on 06/23/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served KY Spangler, City Clerk, Authorized to Accept Service; STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) filed by Hernandez, Joaquin Chavez on 05/27/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) filed by Hernandez, Joaquin Chavez on 05/27/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Gerald Anderson, Occupant; STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) filed by Hernandez, Joaquin Chavez on 05/27/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hernandez, Joaquin Chavez on 05/12/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hernandez, Joaquin Chavez on 05/12/2022. Filed By: Hernandez, Joaquin Chavez(Plaintiff) Refers To: Anderson, Joan(Defendant) | Anderson, Gerald(Defendant) | City of Moorpark(Defendant) | Amouzadeh, Jamaldin(Defendant) | Jamaldin, Amouzadeh(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUIRK LOGAN LAMBERT