This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 09/02/2021 at 07:02:26 (UTC).

Henry Mejia vs. Milgard Manufacturing Inc

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 Henry Mejia filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Milgard Manufacturing Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mejia, Henry

Defendant

Milgard Manufacturing Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chang, Michael H

Defendant Attorney

Gonzalez, Daniel Lopez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion to Compel; Description: Arbitration and Dismiss Action or in the Alternative Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration; Event Status: VACATED; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel - Arbitration and Dismiss Action or in the Alternative Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and Order Referring Matter to Arbitration and Stay of Action) filed by Milgard Manufacturing Inc; Mejia, Henry on 08/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Via E-mail;Served Motion to Compel & Supporting Documents; served to Eghbali Firm) filed by Milgard Manufacturing Inc on 08/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (in Support of Def Milgard Manufacturing LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration & Dismiss Action, or, in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration) filed by Milgard Manufacturing Inc on 08/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Daniel L. Gonzalez in Support of Def Milgard Manufacturing LLC's Motion to Dismiss Action,or, in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration) filed by Milgard Manufacturing Inc on 08/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Alex Rivera in Support of Milgard Manufacturing LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration & Dismiss Action, or in the Alternative Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration) filed by Milgard Manufacturing Inc on 08/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration & Dismiss Action, or, in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration) filed by Milgard Manufacturing Inc on 08/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAmount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 08/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel - Arbitration and Dismiss Action or in the Alternative Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Arbitration & Dismiss Action, or, in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration) filed by Milgard Manufacturing Inc on 08/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketGonzalez, Daniel Lopez added as a effective 08/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Jeff Miner, CT Corporation System, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process) filed by Mejia, Henry on 07/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mejia, Henry on 06/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mejia, Henry on 06/04/2021. Filed By: Mejia, Henry(Plaintiff) Refers To: Milgard Manufacturing Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Milgard Manufacturing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ DANIEL LOPEZ