This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/14/2020 at 06:49:49 (UTC).

Harris vs Channel Islands Aviation

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 Harris filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Channel Islands Aviation. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harris, Taylor

Defendant

Channel Islands Aviation Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lovendosky, Keith A.

Defendant Attorney

Mkryan, Joseph Z

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (7 day); Event Status: VACATED; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docket56-2019-00534301-CU-PO-VTA consolidated with lead case 56-2019-00534291-CU-PO-VTA on 06/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketJury Trial (LC) - (7 day) scheduled for 01/25/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 41 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 12/23/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in 22 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 02/28/2020 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketJury Trial (LC) - (7 day) scheduled for 01/25/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in 41 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 12/23/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in 22 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Harris, Taylor on 02/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Channel Islands Aviation Inc on 02/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Channel Islands Aviation Inc on 01/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (FIRST) filed by Harris, Taylor on 12/03/2019. Filed By: Harris, Taylor(Plaintiff) Refers To: Channel Islands Aviation Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Additional 30 Days to File Responsive Pleading CCP 430.41 (for Defendant to File a Response to Plaintiff, Taylor Harris' Complaint) filed by Channel Islands Aviation Inc on 11/08/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Harris, Taylor on 10/02/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/28/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (Case No 56.19.534077.CU.PO.VTA) filed by Harris, Taylor on 10/01/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint filed by Harris, Taylor on 10/01/2019. Filed By: Harris, Taylor(Plaintiff) Refers To: Channel Islands Aviation Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVENDOSKY KEITH A.