This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/21/2023 at 18:05:39 (UTC).

Hamilton vs Stuart West Coast Title Co

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Hamilton filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Stuart West Coast Title Co. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hamilton, Janet E

Defendants

All Persons Unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest 4063 Doan Street Ventura California 93003 which is adverse to Plaintiffs title or creates any cloud on Plaintiffs title

Stuart West Coast Title Co

The Testate and Intestate Successors of William O Fisher

Stewart West Coast Title Co

Stewart Title of California Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vanarelli, Christina

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOrder for Publication of Summons (of Summons as to all persons unknown) filed by Hamilton, Janet E on 03/10/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOrder for Publication of Summons (as to the Testate and Intestate Successors of William O Fisher) filed by Hamilton, Janet E on 03/10/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketApplication for Order for Publication of Summons filed by Hamilton, Janet E on 02/27/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketApplication for Order for Publication of Summons filed by Hamilton, Janet E on 02/27/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketApplication for Order for Publication of Summons submitted by Hamilton, Janet E rejected on 02/22/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Naming DOE 1 Stewart Title of California Inc aka Stewart West Coast Title Co) filed by Hamilton, Janet E on 02/16/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketStewart Title of California Inc added as a Defendant effective 02/16/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Agent Emmanuel Jacobo of CT Corp) filed by Hamilton, Janet E on 02/07/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketSummons issued on 01/31/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketComplaint - Amended filed by Hamilton, Janet E on 01/31/2023. Filed By: Hamilton, Janet E(Plaintiff) Refers To: All Persons Unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest 4063 Doan Street Ventura California 93003 which is adverse to Plaintiffs title or creates any cloud on Plaintiffs title(Defendant) | Stewart West Coast Title Co(Defendant) | The Testate and Intestate Successors of William O Fisher(Defendant) | Stewart Title of California Inc(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
995 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Bankruptcy Removal; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Status Conference; Description: RE: VISITATION; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Spousal Property Petition; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: Re filing & service of 4th amended complaint; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Permission to Use Trust Funds:Instructions on Trustees Authority to Change Legal Malpractice Attorne...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Description: Verify filing of 60 day evaluation report, general plan and inventory and appraisal; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Termination; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Description: File Proof of Service of Complaint of Countrywide Home Loans as to Defendant Kathleen Lazarus; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Order Under Probate 850(a)(1)(D) for Transfer of Proceeds of Sale of Real Property to A...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less