This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 09/15/2023 at 15:04:04 (UTC).

Hamilton vs Stuart West Coast Title Co

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Hamilton filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Stuart West Coast Title Co. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CUOR

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hamilton, Janet E

Defendants

All Persons Unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest 4063 Doan Street Ventura California 93003 which is adverse to Plaintiffs title or creates any cloud on Plaintiffs title

The Testate and Intestate Successors of William O Fisher

Stewart West Coast Title Co

Stewart Title of California Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vanarelli, Christina

 

Court Documents

Proof of Publication 3/30/2023,4/6/2023, 4/13/2023 &4/20/2023; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff); As to: All Persons Unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest 4063 Doan Street Ventura California 93003 which i

05/15/2023: Proof of Publication 3/30/2023,4/6/2023, 4/13/2023 &4/20/2023; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff); As to: All Persons Unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest 4063 Doan Street Ventura California 93003 which is adverse to Plaintiffs title or creates any cloud on Plaintiffs title (Defendant); The Testate and Intestate Successors of William O Fisher (Defendant); Service Date: 03/30/2023; Service Cost: 225.01

Request for Dismissal as to Stewart-West Coast Title Co ONLY; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart West Coast Title Co (Defendant)

05/24/2023: Request for Dismissal as to Stewart-West Coast Title Co ONLY; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart West Coast Title Co (Defendant)

Proof of Personal Service as to First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title of California Inc (Defendant); Service Date: 02/28/2023; Service Cost: 91.30

05/24/2023: Proof of Personal Service as to First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title of California Inc (Defendant); Service Date: 02/28/2023; Service Cost: 91.30

Request for Entry of Default as to Stewart Title of California, Inc.fka Stewart-West Coast Title Co. ONLY; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title of California Inc (Defendant); Requested Judgment Type: __

05/24/2023: Request for Entry of Default as to Stewart Title of California, Inc.fka Stewart-West Coast Title Co. ONLY; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title of California Inc (Defendant); Requested Judgment Type: __

Request for Entry of Default; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff); As to: All Persons Unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest 4063 Doan Street Ventura California 93003 which is adverse to Plaintiffs title or

07/13/2023: Request for Entry of Default; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff); As to: All Persons Unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest 4063 Doan Street Ventura California 93003 which is adverse to Plaintiffs title or creates any cloud on Plaintiffs title (Defendant); The Testate and Intestate Successors of William O Fisher (Defendant); Requested Judgment Type: __

Notice of Default Prove-Up Hearing; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff)

07/26/2023: Notice of Default Prove-Up Hearing; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff)

Minute Order (Default Prove Up Hearing scheduled by counsel for plainitff)

08/21/2023: Minute Order (Default Prove Up Hearing scheduled by counsel for plainitff)

Exhibit List; Generated by: Court

08/21/2023: Exhibit List; Generated by: Court

Judgment Quieting Title to 4063 Doan Street, Ventura, California 93003 in Favor of Plaintiff Janet E. Hamilton; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff); As to: All Persons Unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest

08/31/2023: Judgment Quieting Title to 4063 Doan Street, Ventura, California 93003 in Favor of Plaintiff Janet E. Hamilton; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff); As to: All Persons Unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest 4063 Doan Street Ventura California 93003 which is adverse to Plaintiffs title or creates any cloud on Plaintiffs title (Defendant); Stewart Title of California Inc (Defendant); The Testate and Intestate Successors of William O Fisher (Defendant)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2024
  • HearingName: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Status: Vacated; Department: Dept 22B / Hall of Justice; Result: Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff Janet E Hamilton against Defendant The Testate and Intestate Successors of William O Fisher, Defendant All Persons Unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest 4063 Doan Street Ventura California 93003 which is adverse to Plaintiffs title or creates any cloud on Plaintiffs title and Defendant Stewart Title of California Inc FKA Stewart West Coast Title Co on the Amended Complaint - Amended (1st) filed by JANET E HAMILTON on 01/31/2023 for a total of $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Quieting Title to 4063 Doan Street, Ventura, California 93003 in Favor of Plaintiff Janet E. Hamilton; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff); As to: All Persons Unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest 4063 Doan Street Ventura California 93003 which is adverse to Plaintiffs title or creates any cloud on Plaintiffs title (Defendant); Stewart Title of California Inc (Defendant); The Testate and Intestate Successors of William O Fisher (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketCourt Order scheduled for 03/11/2024 at 08:15 AM in at Department 22B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • HearingName: Default Prove Up Hearing scheduled by counsel for plainitff; Status: Scheduled; Department: Dept 42 / Hall of Justice; Result: On 08/21/2023, Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List; Generated by: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order (Default Prove Up Hearing scheduled by counsel for plainitff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Default Prove-Up Hearing; Filed by: Hamilton, Janet E (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketDefault Prove Up Hearing scheduled by counsel for plainitff scheduled for 08/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 42

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to The Testate and Intestate Successors of William O Fisher; All Persons Unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest 4063 Doan Street Ventura California 93003 which is adverse to Plaintiffs title or creates any cloud on Plaintiffs title; On the Amended Complaint - Amended (1st) filed by JANET E HAMILTON on 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Naming DOE 1 Stewart Title of California Inc aka Stewart West Coast Title Co) filed by Hamilton, Janet E on 02/16/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketStewart Title of California Inc added as a Defendant effective 02/16/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Agent Emmanuel Jacobo of CT Corp) filed by Hamilton, Janet E on 02/07/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketSummons issued on 01/31/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketComplaint - Amended filed by Hamilton, Janet E on 01/31/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketStewart West Coast Title Co added as a Defendant effective 01/31/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/11/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hamilton, Janet E on 01/12/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hamilton, Janet E on 01/12/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less