This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 20:34:45 (UTC).

Hainline vs. Dutton Plumbing

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Hainline filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dutton Plumbing. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hainline, Gary

Hainline, Rita

Defendants

Dutton Plumbing

Ygrene

Dutton Home Services LLC

Ygrene Energy Fund California LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dorenfeld, David K

MARGOLIN, MICHAEL R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Motion to Enforce Settlement; Description: and for Fees; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketMotion to Enforce Settlement - and for Fees scheduled for 04/05/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Hainline, Gary; Hainline, Rita on 02/24/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketMotion to Enforce Settlement - and for Fees scheduled for 04/05/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketAmount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 02/23/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Bernadette M. Bolan in Support of Defendant Ygrene Energy Fund California LLC's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and for Fees) filed by Ygrene Energy Fund California LLC on 02/23/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketMotion to Enforce Settlement (Agreement and for Fees [CCP 664.6]) filed by Ygrene Energy Fund California LLC on 02/23/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Additional 30 Days to File Responsive Pleading CCP 430.41 filed by Ygrene Energy Fund California LLC on 07/29/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (1st Amended complaint. Served Agent Diana Ruiz, CT Corp) filed by Hainline, Gary; Hainline, Rita on 07/09/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketYgrene Energy Fund California LLC added as a Defendant effective 06/25/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDutton Home Services LLC added as a Defendant effective 06/25/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Doe 2 as to Ygrene Energy Fund California LLC) filed by Hainline, Gary; Hainline, Rita on 06/24/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Doe 1 as to Dutton Home Services LLC dba Dutton Plumbing) filed by Hainline, Gary; Hainline, Rita on 06/24/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 05/04/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (FIRST) filed by Hainline, Gary; Hainline, Rita on 05/04/2021. Filed By: Hainline, Rita(Plaintiff) | Hainline, Gary(Plaintiff) Refers To: Dutton Plumbing(Defendant) | Ygrene(Defendant) | Dutton Home Services LLC(Defendant) | Ygrene Energy Fund California LLC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hainline, Gary; Hainline, Rita on 04/13/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hainline, Gary; Hainline, Rita on 04/13/2021. Filed By: Hainline, Gary(Plaintiff) | Hainline, Rita(Plaintiff) Refers To: Dutton Plumbing(Defendant) | Ygrene(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less