This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 04:19:24 (UTC).

Guy Dougherty vs. Stanley Adams

Case Summary

On 01/23/2012 Guy Dougherty filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Stanley Adams. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Dougherty, Guy

Kim, Sung Chul

Adams, Stanley

Estate of Stanley Adams

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Kim, Sung Chul

Adams, Stanley

Estate of Stanley Adams

Kim, Sung Chu

Nuri, Park

Park, Nuri

Estate of Stanley Adams deceased

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Kappel, Donald E

Gindler, Alan F

Lussman, Paul H III

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ASEL, COLETTE M

FISCHER-REYES, JENNA

Fischer Reyes, Jenna L

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
179 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2012
  • Demand for Jury Trial filed by Kim, Sung Chul; Park, Nuri on 03/12/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • Answer filed by Kim, Sung Chul; Park, Nuri on 03/12/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • ASEL, COLETTE M added as a effective 03/12/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Dougherty, Guy on 02/29/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Nuri Park) filed by Dougherty, Guy on 02/29/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2012
  • Case reassigned to 44 effective 01/27/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • Case assigned to Department S5.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dougherty, Guy on 01/23/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Dougherty, Guy on 01/23/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • Complaint filed by Dougherty, Guy on 01/23/2012. Filed By: Dougherty, Guy(Plaintiff) Refers To: Estate of Stanley Adams(Defendant) | Adams, Stanley(Defendant) | Kim, Sung(Defendant) | Nuri, Park(Defendant) | Kim, Sung(Defendant) | Park, Nuri(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less