This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/24/2020 at 05:05:05 (UTC).

Guadalupe Vicky Rios vs. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Guadalupe Vicky Rios filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gonzales Rios, Brandon L

Rios, Guadalupe Vicky

Defendant

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacobson, Kevin Y

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving CSC/ Susie Vang - Person authorized to accept service on 09-29-20) filed by Rios, Guadalupe Vicky; Gonzales Rios, Brandon L on 10/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 07/22/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rios, Guadalupe Vicky; Gonzales Rios, Brandon L on 09/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Rios, Guadalupe Vicky; Gonzales Rios, Brandon L on 09/24/2020. Filed By: Gonzales Rios, Brandon L(Plaintiff) | Rios, Guadalupe Vicky(Plaintiff) Refers To: General Motors LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less