This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 21:35:23 (UTC).

Growers Depot vs. Ventura Farm Supplies

Case Summary

On 11/08/2016 Growers Depot filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ventura Farm Supplies. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Growers Depot Inc

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Oldfield, Roger

Rippee, Jon

Lopez, Ray

Sanchez, John

Ventura Farm Supplies Company LLC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Rippee, Jon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Killen, W. Bryce

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SHAPERO, STEVEN J.

Elrod, Edward B

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Elrod, Edward B

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to Current Complaint or Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Request For Default Judgment By Court; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Request For Default Judgment By Court; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Request For Default Judgment By Court; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to Current Complaint or Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Request For Default Judgment By Court; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Request For Default Judgment By Court; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Request For Default Judgment By Court; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Growers Depot Inc rejected on 01/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Mrs Jon Rippee wife) filed by Growers Depot Inc on 01/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Steven Shapero via receptionist) filed by Growers Depot Inc on 01/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Complaint - Amended (First) filed by Growers Depot Inc on 12/20/2016. Filed By: Growers Depot Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Ventura Farm Supplies Company LLC(Defendant) | Oldfield, Roger(Defendant) | Lopez, Ray(Defendant) | Sanchez, John(Defendant) | Rippee, Jon(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Growers Depot Inc on 12/20/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Roger Oldfield Agent for service) filed by Growers Depot Inc on 12/20/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/05/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Growers Depot Inc on 11/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Complaint filed by Growers Depot Inc on 11/08/2016. Filed By: Growers Depot Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Ventura Farm Supplies Company LLC(Defendant) | Oldfield, Roger(Defendant) | Lopez, Ray(Defendant) | Sanchez, John(Defendant) | Rippee, Jon(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less