Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/12/2018 at 00:37:26 (UTC).

Groves Property vs. Terry R. Bailey Living Trust et al.,

Case Summary

On 04/12/2010 Groves Property filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Terry R Bailey Living Trust . This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Groves Property Owners Association

Bailey, Sally J

Bailey, Terry R

Sally J Bailey as trustee of the Terry and Sally Bailey Living Trust 2001

Terry R Bailey as trustee of the Terry and Sally Bailey Living Trust 2001

Lawrence S Berk as trustee of the Berk Family Trust

Bettina B Gedney as trustee of the Gedney 1995 Trust

John C Gedney as trustee of the Gedney 1995 Trust

GEDNEY, BETTINA B

GEDNEY, JOHN C

CALZADA, GRACE

BERK, CHARLOTTE N

Grace Calzada as trustee of the Roy and Grace Calzada Trust

Charlette N Berk as Trustee of the Berk Family Trust

Helen O Cochran as trustee of the Helen O Cochran Family Trust

COCHRAN, HELEN O

BERK, LAWRENCE S

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Bailey, Sally J

Bailey, Terry R

Sally J Bailey as trustee of the Terry and Sally Bailey Living Trust 2001

Terry R Bailey as trustee of the Terry and Sally Bailey Living Trust 2001

Bettina B Gedney as trustee of the Gedney 1995 Trust

John C Gedney as trustee of the Gedney 1995 Trust

GEDNEY, BETTINA B

GEDNEY, JOHN C

Helen O Cochran as trustee of the Helen O Cochran Family Trust

COCHRAN, HELEN O

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN, MICHAEL SCOTT

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BAILEY, TERRY R.

GIBSON, KELTON LEE

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (LC); Event Time: 2:59 PM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 1:21 PM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:14 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (LC); Event Time: 2:59 PM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 1:21 PM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
196 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2010
  • Amount of 355.00 received for 134- Answer or other 1st paper >$25K on 06/07/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Amount of 355.00 received for 134- Answer or other 1st paper >$25K on 06/07/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Demurrer filed by Sally J. Bailey individually and as trustee of the Terry and Sally Bailey Living Trust 2001, dated August 6, 2001; Terry R. Bailey individually and as trustee of the Terry and Sally Bailey Living Trust 2001, dated August 6, 2001 on 06/07/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Groves Property Owners Association on 04/29/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by subserving Terry R Bailey co-occupant) filed by Groves Property Owners Association on 04/29/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Groves Property Owners Association on 04/29/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Groves Property Owners Association on 04/14/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • Case assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Groves Property Owners Association on 04/12/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • Complaint filed by Groves Property Owners Association on 04/12/2010. Filed By: Groves Property Owners Association(Plaintiff) Refers To: Bailey, Terry(Defendant) | Bailey, Sally(Defendant) | Terry R Bailey as trustee of the Terry and Sally Bailey Living Trust 2001 dated August 6 2001(Defendant) | Sally J Bailey as trustee of the Terry and Sally Bailey Living Trust 2001 dated August 6 2001(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAILEY TERRY