This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 20:46:47 (UTC).

Griselda Castro vs. City of Thousand Oaks

Case Summary

On 03/06/2013 Griselda Castro filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against City of Thousand Oaks. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Appellants

Castro, Griselda

Mariano, Diana

Mariano, Humberto

Mariano, Yazmin

Brito, Alyson Naomi

Serrano Nino, Carlos Miguel

Petitioner

Brito, Jason

Plaintiff and Claimant

Brito, Alyson Naomi

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Respondent / Appellees

City of Thousand Oaks

Serrano Nino, Carlos Miguel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

GRASSINI, LAWRENCE P.

FLAHAVAN, WILLIAM F

Mandell, Barbara J.

Plaintiff, Claimant and Petitioner Attorney

FLAHAVAN, WILLIAM F

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Mandell, Barbara J.

HARDIN, RICK

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

HARDIN, RICK

COATS, BENJAMIN F.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 8:37 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 3:48 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 4:26 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition to Approve Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 9:59 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Tax Costs (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
390 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2013
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Lillian Gonzalez co resident) filed by Castro, Griselda on 04/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Melissa LEngle administrative clerk and person auth to accept) filed by Castro, Griselda on 03/22/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • Summons issued on 02/28/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Griselda Castro) filed by Mariano, Diana on 02/28/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Griselda Castro) filed by Mariano, Yazmin on 02/28/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • Castro, Griselda added as a Guardian Ad Litem effective 02/15/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 07/24/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Castro, Griselda; Mariano, Humberto; Mariano, Diana; Mariano, Yazmin on 02/15/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • Complaint filed by Castro, Griselda; Mariano, Humberto; Mariano, Diana; Mariano, Yazmin on 02/15/2013. Filed By: Castro, Griselda(Plaintiff) | Mariano, Humberto(Plaintiff) | Mariano, Diana(Plaintiff) | Mariano, Yazmin(Plaintiff) Refers To: City of Thousand Oaks(Defendant) | Serrano Nino, Carlos(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less