Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/14/2021 at 00:01:12 (UTC).

Grace Kiang vs. Sherri J Krol

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 Grace Kiang filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Sherri J Krol. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kiang, Grace

Defendants

Krol, Sherri J

Krol, Nick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOEB, STEVEN S

Defendant Attorney

NOMI, BRIAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Demurrer (UD); Description: to Complaint; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to the Demurrer Filed by Defendant Nick Krol) filed by Kiang, Grace on 06/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address and/or Telephone filed by Kiang, Grace on 05/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDemurrer (UD) - to Complaint scheduled for 06/14/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 27 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDemurrer filed by Krol, Nick on 05/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted) filed by Krol, Nick on 05/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketKrol, Nick Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Krol, Nick on 05/24/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Krol, Sherri J on 05/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNOMI, BRIAN added as a effective 05/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketApplication for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing filed by Kiang, Grace on 04/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations filed by Kiang, Grace on 04/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 27.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kiang, Grace on 04/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kiang, Grace on 04/06/2021. Filed By: Kiang, Grace(Plaintiff) Refers To: Krol, Sherri(Defendant) | Krol, Nick(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOEB, STEVEN S