Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 09:15:26 (UTC).

Grace Hodgson vs. Anthony Jauregui

Case Summary

On 11/24/2015 Grace Hodgson filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Anthony Jauregui. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hodgson, Grace

Defendant

Jauregui, Anthony

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Case disposed with disposition of Judgment uncontested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Judgment for Hodgson, Grace against Jauregui, Anthony in the amount of: 3701.21 principal, punitive damages, 50.00 costs, pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees entered on 02/29/2016. None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 02/29/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • The Court finds judgment on Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court FOR Grace Hodgson and AGAINST Anthony Jauregui in the amount of $3701.21 principal, $50.00 costs. Judgment Details: None. Sub Disposition type After Hearing - Judgment uncontested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal (Served On 1/27/2016; Cost: 0.00) filed by Hodgson, Grace on 02/11/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (RESET) filed by Hodgson, Grace on 01/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 02/29/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (RESET) filed by Hodgson, Grace on 12/28/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 02/01/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 12/28/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 12/28/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Hodgson, Grace on 11/24/2015. Filed By: Hodgson, Grace(Plaintiff) Refers To: Jauregui, Anthony(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less