This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/27/2023 at 13:22:00 (UTC).

Gonzalez vs. Aluminum

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 Gonzalez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Aluminum. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gonzalez, Maikel

Defendant

Aluminum Precision Products Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moon, Kane

Defendant Attorney

Berkowitz, Paul

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 9:54 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to Intervene; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to Intervene; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Court finding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketJudgment for Gonzalez, Maikel against Aluminum Precision Products Inc in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 02/24/2023. See judgment for details

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketJudgment by Court After Hearing (Final Judgment) filed by Gonzalez, Maikel on 02/24/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Approving Settlement of Claims Brought Pursuant to the Private Attorneys General Act of 2004) filed by Gonzalez, Maikel on 02/24/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Court Order) filed by Gonzalez, Maikel on 02/16/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketAmended (Notice of Court Order) submitted by Aluminum Precision Products Inc rejected on 02/15/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketNotice - Other (Of Order Denying Petition For Coordination) filed by Maldonado, John Jr; Maratas, Gregory; Sandoval, Bernardo; Law Offices of Sima Farde on 02/07/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSandoval, Bernardo added as a Interested Party effective 11/17/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketMaratas, Gregory added as a Interested Party effective 11/17/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketMaldonado, John Jr added as a Interested Party effective 11/17/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case ((56-2020-00546795-CU-OE-VTA)) filed by Aluminum Precision Products Inc on 11/14/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Aluminum Precision Products Inc on 11/14/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketBerkowitz, Paul added as a effective 11/14/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/15/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gonzalez, Maikel on 11/03/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Gonzalez, Maikel on 11/03/2022. Filed By: Gonzalez, Maikel(Plaintiff) Refers To: Aluminum Precision Products Inc(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less