This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 05:14:33 (UTC).

Go Creative Wireless vs Roesch

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 Go Creative Wireless filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Roesch. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Creative Wireless Technology Solutions

Go Creative Wireless LLC

Defendants

Roesch, Charles Ellis

Dickeson, Mike

Neighbornet Inc

Terpe, Robert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Knauss, Joanne Mirras

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (CLM); Event Time: 3:24 PM; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Request For Default Judgment By Court; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSummons issued on 06/13/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Summons on First Amended Complaint) submitted by Creative Wireless Technology Solutions; Go Creative Wireless LLC rejected on 06/10/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (FIRST) filed by Go Creative Wireless LLC; Creative Wireless Technology Solutions on 06/10/2022. Filed By: Creative Wireless Technology Solutions(Plaintiff) | Go Creative Wireless LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Terpe, Robert(Defendant) | Neighbornet Inc(Defendant) | Roesch, Charles(Defendant) | Dickeson, Mike(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDickeson, Mike added as a Defendant effective 06/10/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketTerpe, Robert added as a Defendant effective 06/10/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNeighbornet Inc added as a Defendant effective 06/10/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCase reclassified from Civil - Limited to Civil - Unlimited on 05/31/2022 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Ex Parte; Description: Ex Parte motion for change of venue to unlimited jurisdiction; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default and Judgment; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Erica Williams Shatee in Support of Motion for Mandatory Injunction and Turn-Over Order) filed by Creative Wireless Technology Solutions; Go Creative Wireless LLC on 01/03/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketMotion - Other (CLM) - for Mandatory Injunction and Turn Over Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities scheduled for 01/21/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Taking Motion for Mandatory Injunction and Turn-Over Order Off Calendar) filed by Creative Wireless Technology Solutions; Go Creative Wireless LLC on 12/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 12/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketMotion - Other (CLM) - for Mandatory Injunction and Turn Over Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities scheduled for 01/21/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Erica Williams Shatee in Support of Motion for Mandatory Injunction and Turn Over Order) filed by Go Creative Wireless LLC; Creative Wireless Technology Solutions on 12/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketMotion - Other (for Mandatory Injunction and Turn Over Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed by Go Creative Wireless LLC; Creative Wireless Technology Solutions on 12/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Go Creative Wireless LLC; Creative Wireless Technology Solutions on 11/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Go Creative Wireless LLC; Creative Wireless Technology Solutions on 11/18/2021. Filed By: Creative Wireless Technology Solutions(Plaintiff) | Go Creative Wireless LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Roesch, Charles(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KNAUSS JOANNE MIRRAS