This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 22:19:34 (UTC).

GMM Property vs Walker

Case Summary

On 11/30/2016 GMM Property filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Walker. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Walker, Raymond

GMM Property Management Company

Walker, Naveen

Mendoza, Gregoria

Schwam, Dennis

Velasquez, Dolores

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Naveen B Walker individually and as Trustee of The Walker Family Trust udt

Raymond E Walker individually and as Trustee of The Walker Family Trust udt

GMM Property Management Company (Corp)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Freedman, Jerry L.

Zaehringer, Martin

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 9:06 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Walker, Raymond; Walker, Naveen on 09/06/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Minutes finalized for heard 01/03/2017 09:06:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Status Conference - Setting of MSC and Trial Dates scheduled for 05/08/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by GMM Property Management Company on 12/06/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Notice of Related Case (Case No 56.2016.00486190.SC.SC.VTA) filed by GMM Property Management Company on 12/01/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Summons issued on 11/30/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/24/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by GMM Property Management Company on 11/30/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Complaint filed by GMM Property Management Company on 11/30/2016. Filed By: GMM Property Management Company(Plaintiff) Refers To: Raymond E Walker individually and as Trustee of The Walker Family Trust udt 03.20.1992(Defendant) | Naveen B Walker individually and as Trustee of The Walker Family Trust udt 03.20.1992(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less