Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:10 (UTC).

Gloria Marie Versluis vs. Manuel Salcedo Garcia

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Gloria Marie Versluis filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Manuel Salcedo Garcia. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Versluis, Gloria Marie

Defendant

Garcia, Manuel Salcedo

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 23; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 23; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2017
  • Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 08/12/2014 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 08/12/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 23 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Versluis, Gloria Marie on 08/12/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (service to Rocio Mijangos, co occupant, on 7-28-14, mailed on 7-28-14, cost of $85.00) filed by Versluis, Gloria Marie on 07/30/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 08/12/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 23 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 48.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Versluis, Gloria Marie on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Versluis, Gloria Marie(Plaintiff) Refers To: Garcia, Manuel(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less