This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 08:26:37 (UTC).

Gloria Arroyo vs. GMM Property Management Co

Case Summary

On 01/09/2014 Gloria Arroyo filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GMM Property Management Co. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arroyo, Gloria

Ayala, Ruben

Defendants

GMM Property Management Co

Walker, Naveen

Walker, Raymond

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nielsen, Jonathan L

Defendant Attorney

Velasco, Gerald B

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (time estimate 5 days); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2014
  • Walker, Naveen added as a Defendant effective 02/20/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Amendment to Complaint (Doe 1) filed by Arroyo, Gloria; Ayala, Ruben on 02/20/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Walker, Raymond added as a Defendant effective 02/20/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Motion to Strike - punitive damages scheduled for 03/12/2014 at 08:20:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Amount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 02/13/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Motion to Strike (puntive damages) filed by GMM Property Management Co on 02/13/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 06/09/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Arroyo, Gloria; Ayala, Ruben on 01/09/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • Complaint filed by Arroyo, Gloria; Ayala, Ruben on 01/09/2014. Filed By: Arroyo, Gloria(Plaintiff) | Ayala, Ruben(Plaintiff) Refers To: Walker, Raymond(Defendant) | Walker, Naveen(Defendant) | GMM Property Management Co(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less