This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 22:28:17 (UTC).

Glenn Eric Braly vs. COUNTY OF VENTURA

Case Summary

On 04/18/2013 Glenn Eric Braly filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF VENTURA. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Braly, Glenn Eric

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

COUNTY OF VENTURA

Officer Lamborn

City of Ventura

City of San Buenaventura

Lamborn, Officer Robert

Robert Lamborn

Cross Defendant

Wood Ranch Barbecue and Grill Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Zelner, Barry S

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Viets, Andy H

Calonne, Ariel Pierre

Cross Defendant Attorney

O Connor, Edward R.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (MSC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (MSC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
168 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2013
  • Opposition (to Petition for Order Relieving Petitioner from Provisions of Government Code Section 945.4; Request for Judicial Notice; Evidentiary Objections; Points & Authorities; Declarations; Exhibits) filed by Lamborn, Officer Robert on 07/23/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Complaint - Amended (First) filed by Braly, Glenn Eric on 06/13/2013. Filed By: Braly, Glenn Eric(Plaintiff) Refers To: City of Ventura(Defendant) | Lamborn, Officer(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Lamborn, Officer Robert added as a Defendant effective 06/13/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Notice of Hearing (for Petition for Order Relieving Petitioner from Provisions of Government Code Sec 945.4) filed by Braly, Glenn Eric on 06/13/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Petition - Other - Govt code 945.4 relieving petitioner scheduled for 08/05/2013 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Petition - Other (for Order Relieving Petitioner From Provisions of Government Code Sec 945.4) filed by Braly, Glenn Eric on 06/13/2013. Filed By: Braly, Glenn Eric(Petitioner) Refers To: City of San Buenaventura(Respondent) | Robert Lamborn(Respondent) | COUNTY OF VENTURA(Respondent) | Officer Lamborn(Respondent) | City of Ventura(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • City of Ventura added as a Respondent effective 06/13/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/23/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • Complaint filed by Braly, Glenn Eric on 04/18/2013. Filed By: Braly, Glenn Eric(Plaintiff) Refers To: COUNTY OF VENTURA(Defendant) | Officer Lamborn(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wood Ranch Barbecue & Grill Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'CONNOR EDWARD R.