This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/09/2022 at 09:01:56 (UTC).

Gerhard Apfelthaler vs. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 Gerhard Apfelthaler filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Apfelthaler, Gerhard

Defendants

General Motors LLC

Silver Star Motor Car Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zolonz, Adam

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent, by Serving Lai Saevang, Agent for Service of Process) filed by Apfelthaler, Gerhard on 08/17/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Apfelthaler, Gerhard on 07/27/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Apfelthaler, Gerhard on 07/27/2022. Filed By: Apfelthaler, Gerhard(Plaintiff) Refers To: General Motors LLC(Defendant) | Silver Star Motor Car Company(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVER STAR MOTOR CAR COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOLONZ ADAM M.