This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 03/01/2021 at 12:24:39 (UTC).

George Stephan Suchand, conservator for Alison Leigh Suchand vs. Kathan Thomas Shrader

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 George Stephan Suchand, conservator for Alison Leigh Suchand filed an Other lawsuit against Kathan Thomas Shrader. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

George Stephan Suchand, conservator for Alison Leigh Suchand

Respondent

Shrader, Kathan Thomas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Department 32 effective 02/07/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS) served on Defendant. Copy forwarded to Sheriff for entry in CLETS (EA-130) filed by George Stephan Suchand, conservator for Alison Leigh Suchand on 12/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders; Description: TRO Denied 11/19/20; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketRestraining order as requested is granted, order expires 12/08/25 at midnight.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders has been Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketElder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order After Hearing (Restraining Order to Expire 12/08/2025) filed by George Stephan Suchand, conservator for Alison Leigh Suchand on 12/08/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by George Stephan Suchand, conservator for Alison Leigh Suchand on 11/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketHearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - TRO Denied 11/19/20 scheduled for 12/08/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 33 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by George Stephan Suchand, conservator for Alison Leigh Suchand on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Denied) filed by George Stephan Suchand, conservator for Alison Leigh Suchand on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by George Stephan Suchand, conservator for Alison Leigh Suchand on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders filed by George Stephan Suchand, conservator for Alison Leigh Suchand on 11/19/2020. Filed By: George Stephan Suchand, conservator for Alison Leigh Suchand(Petitioner) Refers To: Shrader, Kathan(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less