This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 21:08:57 (UTC).

Garfield vs DTS Inc

Case Summary

On 10/26/2016 Garfield filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against DTS Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Garfield on Behalf of Himself and All Others Similarly Situated

Defendants

Molina, V Sue

Andrews, Craig S

Kirchner, Jon E

Centerview Partners LLC

Kirchner, John E

Habiger, David C

Cohen, Eric

Tessera Technologies Inc

Ballard, L Gregory

DTS Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hulett, Kirk B.

Defendant Attorneys

BROWNLIE, ROBERT W.

Park, Amy S.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 9:36 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 9:36 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Description: Complex Case Designation; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion to Dismiss; Description: or Stay and Joinder in the DTS Defendants'; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Joinder; Description: in Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Stay; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion to Dismiss; Description: or Stay; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CLM); Description: on behalf of plaintiff; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CLM); Description: on behalf of plaintiff; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2016
  • Amount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 10/31/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Motion - Other (CLM) - for TRO scheduled for 11/30/2016 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Declaration - Other (of Kirk B Hulett in support of plaintiffs application for temporary restraining order and expedited discovery) filed by Robert Garfield on Behalf of Himself and All Others Similarly Situated on 10/31/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Proof of Service filed by Robert Garfield on Behalf of Himself and All Others Similarly Situated on 10/31/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of plaintiffs application for a temporary restraining order and expedited discovery) filed by Robert Garfield on Behalf of Himself and All Others Similarly Situated on 10/31/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Motion - Other (Plaintiffs application for a tempotary restraining order and expedited discovery) filed by Robert Garfield on Behalf of Himself and All Others Similarly Situated on 10/31/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/27/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Robert Garfield on Behalf of Himself and All Others Similarly Situated on 10/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Complaint (For Breach of Fiduciary Duty and Failure to Disclose) filed by Robert Garfield on Behalf of Himself and All Others Similarly Situated on 10/26/2016. Filed By: Robert Garfield on Behalf of Himself and All Others Similarly Situated(Plaintiff) Refers To: DTS Inc(Defendant) | Kirchner, John(Defendant) | Andrews, Craig(Defendant) | Ballard, L(Defendant) | Cohen, Eric(Defendant) | Habiger, David(Defendant) | Molina, V(Defendant) | Tessera Technologies Inc(Defendant) | Centerview Partners LLC(Defendant) | Kirchner, Jon(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less