This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/31/2023 at 10:02:33 (UTC).

Garcia vs. Rite Aid

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 Garcia filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Rite Aid. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garcia, Gerardo

Defendants

Doe, Ted

Rite Aid Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Azizi, Daniel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/22/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garcia, Gerardo on 01/19/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketComplaint filed by Garcia, Gerardo on 01/19/2023. Filed By: Garcia, Gerardo(Plaintiff) Refers To: Rite Aid Corporation(Defendant) | Doe, Ted(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2002
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 7 days 0:00 hours; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:30 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2002
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 10 days 0:00 hours; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2002
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 10 days 0:00 hours; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2002
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Description: COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 5 days 0:00 hours.; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2002
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Description: COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 5 days 0:00 hours.; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:30 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2002
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 15 days 0:00 hours; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
984 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Bankruptcy Removal; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Status Conference; Description: RE: VISITATION; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Spousal Property Petition; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: Re filing & service of 4th amended complaint; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Permission to Use Trust Funds:Instructions on Trustees Authority to Change Legal Malpractice Attorne...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Description: Verify filing of 60 day evaluation report, general plan and inventory and appraisal; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Termination; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Description: File Proof of Service of Complaint of Countrywide Home Loans as to Defendant Kathleen Lazarus; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Order Under Probate 850(a)(1)(D) for Transfer of Proceeds of Sale of Real Property to A...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less