This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/10/2021 at 00:01:29 (UTC).

Garcia Mortuary LLC vs. Raul Meza

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Garcia Mortuary LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Raul Meza. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Garcia, Robert Rey Jr

Garcia Mortuary LLC

Defendants

Continental Exchange Solutions Inc

First Bank

Meza, Raul

Mendoza Oseguera, Ricardo

Discoteca Mi Pueblito

Oseguera, Ricardo Mendoza

Keybank National Association

Continental Exchange Solutions Inc a Kansas Corporation

Oseguera, Maria

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

First Bank

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Oseguera, Ricardo Mendoza

ROES 1 through 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vanarelli, Christina

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

LEE, DAVID P. ESQ

SALAS, VICTOR

Ahern, Eileen M

Barclay, Thomas Y

Rosen, Glenn T

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SALAS, VICTOR

Rosen, Glenn T

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Deem Facts Admitted; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 4:03 PM; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/10/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by First Bank on 08/31/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Oseguera, Maria on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (Entered as to Maria Oseguera ONLY; NOT ENTERED as to Discoteca Mi Pueblito as Defendant was Previously Defaulted on 02 18 2020) filed by Garcia Mortuary LLC; Garcia, Robert Rey Jr on 08/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Garcia Mortuary LLC on 07/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of Unsuccessful Service filed by Garcia Mortuary LLC on 05/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Teresa Ascarate Legal Counsel AA) filed by Garcia Mortuary LLC; Garcia, Robert Rey Jr on 01/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Ricardo Mendoza Oseguera Owner) filed by Garcia Mortuary LLC; Garcia, Robert Rey Jr on 01/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Karen Higdon, Asst Manager) filed by Garcia, Robert Rey Jr on 01/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Garcia Mortuary LLC rejected on 01/08/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Garcia Mortuary LLC on 01/08/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Garcia Mortuary LLC on 01/08/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/13/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garcia Mortuary LLC; Garcia, Robert Rey Jr on 12/10/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint filed by Garcia Mortuary LLC; Garcia, Robert Rey Jr on 12/10/2019. Filed By: Garcia Mortuary LLC(Plaintiff) | Garcia, Robert Rey Jr(Plaintiff) Refers To: Discoteca Mi Pueblito(Defendant) | Meza, Raul(Defendant) | Continental Exchange Solutions Inc(Defendant) | First Bank(Defendant) | Mendoza Oseguera, Ricardo(Defendant) | Oseguera, Ricardo(Defendant) | Keybank National Association(Defendant) | Continental Exchange Solutions Inc a Kansas Corporation(Defendant) | Oseguera, Maria(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Continental Exchange Solutions Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where KeyBank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALAS, VICTOR