Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 04:01:25 (UTC).

Gallardo vs Negar Kohandarvish DDS

Case Summary

On 06/24/2015 Gallardo filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Negar Kohandarvish DDS. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Gallardo, Nancy

Lopez, Laura

Cazares Garcia, Elsa

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Negar Kohandarvish DDS Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GILL, MONTY S.

Martinez, David

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MOGHADDAMI, ALI R

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (CLM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 1:44 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (CLM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 1:44 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (CLM); Description: On for reference only to case 15-469098; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 1:44 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2015
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Negar Kohandarvish DDS Inc on 08/06/2015. Filed By: Negar Kohandarvish DDS Inc(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Gallardo, Nancy(Cross - Defendant) | Lopez, Laura(Cross - Defendant) | Cazares Garcia, Elsa(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Cazares Garcia, Elsa added as a Cross - Defendant effective 08/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Lopez, Laura added as a Cross - Defendant effective 08/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Answer filed by Negar Kohandarvish DDS Inc on 08/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Gallardo, Nancy on 07/16/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Summons issued on 06/24/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/25/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gallardo, Nancy on 06/24/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Complaint filed by Gallardo, Nancy on 06/24/2015. Filed By: Gallardo, Nancy(Plaintiff) Refers To: Negar Kohandarvish DDS Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOGHADDAMI ALI R.