This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/14/2023 at 08:02:31 (UTC).

Frontier California Inc vs. County of Ventura

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 Frontier California Inc filed an Other lawsuit against County of Ventura. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frontier California Inc

Defendants

California State Board of Equalization

County of Ventura

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/15/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/15/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Frontier California Inc on 02/14/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Frontier California Inc on 02/14/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketComplaint (for Property Tax Refund and Declaratory Judgment) filed by Frontier California Inc on 02/14/2023. Filed By: Frontier California Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: California State Board of Equalization(Defendant) | County of Ventura(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketComplaint (for Property Tax Refund and Declaratory Judgment) filed by Frontier California Inc on 02/14/2023. Filed By: Frontier California Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: California State Board of Equalization(Defendant) | County of Ventura(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2002
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 7 days 0:00 hours; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:30 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2002
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 7 days 0:00 hours; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:30 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1,159 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Bankruptcy Removal; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Status Conference; Description: RE: VISITATION; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Spousal Property Petition; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: Re filing & service of 4th amended complaint; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Permission to Use Trust Funds:Instructions on Trustees Authority to Change Legal Malpractice Attorne...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Description: Verify filing of 60 day evaluation report, general plan and inventory and appraisal; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Termination; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Description: File Proof of Service of Complaint of Countrywide Home Loans as to Defendant Kathleen Lazarus; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Order Under Probate 850(a)(1)(D) for Transfer of Proceeds of Sale of Real Property to A...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less