This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 03/30/2023 at 11:04:03 (UTC).

Freeway Funding LLC vs. BBC Investment

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 Freeway Funding LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BBC Investment. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freeway Funding Inc

Defendants

BBC Investment Group LLC

Delamora, Alex

The Hudson Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, BARRY A

Defendant Attorney

Gascou, Christian J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2024
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Sarai Marin, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation Inc, Registered Agent) filed by Freeway Funding Inc on 02/22/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Freeway Funding Inc on 02/22/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Alex Delamora, Agent for Service of Process) filed by Freeway Funding Inc on 02/22/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketAnswer filed by The Hudson Insurance Company on 02/22/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/01/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Freeway Funding Inc on 01/04/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketComplaint filed by Freeway Funding Inc on 01/04/2023. Filed By: Freeway Funding Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: The Hudson Insurance Company(Defendant) | Delamora, Alex(Defendant) | BBC Investment Group LLC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less