This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/08/2023 at 05:02:34 (UTC).

Freeway Funding Inc vs. Allure Automotive LLC

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 Freeway Funding Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Allure Automotive LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freeway Funding Inc

Defendants

Allure Automotive LLC

Rizzo, Lacresha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, BARRY A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2024
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/05/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Freeway Funding Inc on 01/04/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/05/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Freeway Funding Inc on 11/09/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Freeway Funding Inc on 11/09/2022. Filed By: Freeway Funding Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Rizzo, Lacresha(Defendant) | Allure Automotive LLC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FREEWAY FUNDING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH BARRY A. ESQ.