This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 11:10:47 (UTC).

Fred Zielsdorf vs. Alaniz

Case Summary

On 06/28/2012 Fred Zielsdorf filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Alaniz. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Fred Zielsdorf Executor of the Estate of Bryan Spencer

Fidelity National Title Company

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Alaniz, Carl

ReMax Olson & Associates Inc Commercial

Remax Gold Coast

Theys, Thom

Evans Sipes Inc

Evan Sipes Inc

Fidelity National Title Company

Jorns, Debra

ReMax Olson & Associates Inc

Kniss, Deborah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

OSBORNE, BRIAN A.

Taylor, Drew M

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Taylor, Drew M

KOFFMAN, GREGORY S.

Lee, Sharlene D

Arrieta, Cristian Raul

KALE, MICHAEL A.

GORNEY, DAVID

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KOFFMAN, GREGORY S.

Arrieta, Cristian Raul

KALE, MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 1:50 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 1:50 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 1:50 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 1:50 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 1:50 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 1:50 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 2:01 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 46; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Joinder; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Trial Setting Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Trial Setting Conference; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
331 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2012
  • Amount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 08/14/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • Demurrer (to Complaint) filed by Alaniz, Carl on 08/14/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Kristine Uhley office administrator) filed by Fred Zielsdorf Executor of the Estate of Bryan Spencer on 07/11/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Kristine Uhley Office administrator) filed by Fred Zielsdorf Executor of the Estate of Bryan Spencer on 07/11/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Barbara Espericueta manager) filed by Fred Zielsdorf Executor of the Estate of Bryan Spencer on 07/09/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Barbara Espericueta manager) filed by Fred Zielsdorf Executor of the Estate of Bryan Spencer on 07/09/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 44.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Fred Zielsdorf Executor of the Estate of Bryan Spencer on 06/28/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fred Zielsdorf Executor of the Estate of Bryan Spencer on 06/28/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Complaint filed by Fred Zielsdorf Executor of the Estate of Bryan Spencer on 06/28/2012. Filed By: Fred Zielsdorf Executor of the Estate of Bryan Spencer(Plaintiff) Refers To: Remax Gold Coast(Defendant) | Alaniz, Carl(Defendant) | ReMax Olson & Associates Inc Commercial(Defendant) | Theys, Thom(Defendant) | ReMax Olson & Associates Inc(Defendant) | Kniss, Deborah(Defendant) | Evans Sipes Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less