This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/05/2022 at 17:26:53 (UTC).

Frank Brisslinger vs. Joseph Cornwall

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Frank Brisslinger filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Joseph Cornwall. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brisslinger, Frank

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Genson, Breeanne

Cornwall, Michael

Cornwall, Joseph

Genson, Breeann

Cornerstone Community Church of Moorpark Inc

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Cornwall, Michael

Cornwall, Joseph

Genson, Breeann

Cornerstone Community Church of Moorpark Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wilfert, Roslynn M.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

OHara, Brian C

Hitch, Dave H.

Roeb, Craig A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Amended; Re: Answer; Demand for Jury Trial, Cross Complaint, see document for complete caption) filed by Cornerstone Community Church of Moorpark Inc on 03/14/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer (to Cross Complaint) filed by Genson, Breeann on 03/04/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Department 40 effective 02/24/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge Pursuant to 170.6 CCP filed by Cornerstone Community Church of Moorpark Inc on 02/22/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketSummons issued on 02/22/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Cornerstone Community Church of Moorpark Inc on 02/22/2022. Filed By: Cornerstone Community Church of Moorpark Inc(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Genson, Breeanne(Cross - Defendant) | Genson, Breeann(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice - Other (Re Demand for Jury Trial and Posting of Fees) filed by Cornerstone Community Church of Moorpark Inc on 02/22/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint. Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Cornerstone Community Church of Moorpark Inc on 02/22/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served upon Gordy Duncan by leaving with Julie Doe (withheld last name)-Authorized to Accept Service on 12/4/21) filed by Brisslinger, Frank on 12/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Doe 26 as to Cornerstone Community Church of Moorpark Inc) filed by Brisslinger, Frank on 10/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Cornwall, Joseph; Cornwall, Michael on 06/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Cornwall, Joseph; Cornwall, Michael on 06/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Cornwall, Joseph; Cornwall, Michael on 06/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Robert Genson, Husband & Co Occupant) filed by Brisslinger, Frank on 06/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Joseph Cornwall, Co Occupant) filed by Brisslinger, Frank on 06/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Brisslinger, Frank on 06/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 04/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Brisslinger, Frank on 04/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Brisslinger, Frank on 04/13/2021. Filed By: Brisslinger, Frank(Plaintiff) Refers To: Cornwall, Joseph(Defendant) | Cornwall, Michael(Defendant) | Genson, Breeanne(Defendant) | Genson, Breeann(Defendant) | Cornerstone Community Church of Moorpark Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wilfert, Roslynn M.