Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:23 (UTC).

Frances Forster vs. Top Nail & Spa

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Frances Forster filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Top Nail Spa. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Forster, Frances

Defendants

Lau, Danny

Top Nail & Spa

Top Nails & Spa

Nguyen, Yen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOENIG, ROBERT A

Defendant Attorney

Caudill, Dana K

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 5 Day Time Est.; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Description: to Reclassify; Memo of p&a's; Decl. of Dana K. Caudill; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2014
  • Demurrer (CLM) - scheduled for 08/27/2014 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • Amount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 07/30/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • Amount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 07/30/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • Demurrer filed by Top Nail & Spa; Lau, Danny on 07/30/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • Top Nails & Spa added as a Defendant effective 07/30/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute submitted by Forster, Frances rejected on 07/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/17/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Forster, Frances on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by Forster, Frances on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Forster, Frances(Plaintiff) Refers To: Top Nail & Spa(Defendant) | Lau, Danny(Defendant) | Top Nails & Spa(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less