This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 12/11/2021 at 07:18:38 (UTC).

Foreman Financial Inc vs Garcia

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 Foreman Financial Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Garcia. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC

Defendant

Garcia, Esteban

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leventhal, Jonathan D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 06/26/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketJudgment for FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC against Garcia, Esteban in the amount of: 25576.14 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 494.00 costs, 651.00 pre-judgment interest, and 2828.80 attorney fees entered on 05/28/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court filed by FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC on 05/28/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC on 05/20/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to All DOES Defendants ONLY) filed by FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC on 05/20/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Garcia, Esteban on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (and Court Judgment) filed by FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC on 05/20/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC on 03/22/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 06/26/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC on 01/28/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint filed by FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC on 01/28/2019. Filed By: FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Garcia, Esteban(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVENTHAL JONATHAN DAVID