This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 03/01/2023 at 08:00:53 (UTC).

Foldes vs. Waste Management of CA Inc

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 Foldes filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Waste Management of CA Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Foldes, Christine

Defendants

G I Industries Inc

Salinas, Herberto

Waste Management of California Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Malin, Garry S

Defendant Attorney

Bordin Wosk, Joshua

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by G I Industries Inc on 11/28/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/15/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Foldes, Christine on 11/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Foldes, Christine on 11/01/2022. Filed By: Foldes, Christine(Plaintiff) Refers To: Salinas, Herberto(Defendant) | G I Industries Inc(Defendant) | Waste Management of California Inc(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less