This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/10/2020 at 07:58:27 (UTC).

Flores vs Board of Registered Nursing

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Flores filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against Board of Registered Nursing. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Flores, Veronica

Respondent

Board of Registered Nursing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GALICI, SAMUEL F.

Respondent Attorney

Malek, Morgan

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Change of Venue (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Change of Venue (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Change of Venue (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Change of Venue (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Change of Venue (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCase Transferred and sent to Los Angeles County on 7/9/20. Certified mail receipt number 9414 7266 9904 2138 7291 55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketTransfer Out to Los Angeles County; Certified mail receipt number 9414 7266 9904 2138 7291 55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Transferred Action to Los Angeles County and Declaration of Mailing by clerk filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCase file contents transferred to receiving court Los Angeles pursuant to court order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Granting Respondent Board of Registered Nursings Motion to Change the Venue to Los Angeles Superior Court Central District) filed by Board of Registered Nursing on 03/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Granting Respondent Board of Regitered Nursing's Motion to Change the Venue to Los Angeles Superior Court, Central District) filed by Board of Registered Nursing on 02/28/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion for Change of Venue (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion for Change of Venue (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Motion for Change of Venue (CLM); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion for Change of Venue (CLM) heard 02/26/2020 08:20:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Ex Parte; Description: stay of administrative hearing until review of Writ of Mandate; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/27/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketOpposition (To Petitioners Ex Parte Application for Stay of Administrative Decision) filed by Board of Registered Nursing on 11/27/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPetition - Amended (FIRST) filed by Flores, Veronica on 11/26/2019. Filed By: Flores, Veronica(Petitioner) Refers To: Board of Registered Nursing(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEx Parte - stay of administrative hearing until review of Writ of Mandate scheduled for 11/27/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other (for Stay of Administrative Decision; Declaration of Samuel F Galici; & Memo of Points & Authorities) filed by Flores, Veronica on 11/26/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Flores, Veronica on 11/22/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed by Flores, Veronica on 11/22/2019. Filed By: Flores, Veronica(Petitioner) Refers To: Board of Registered Nursing(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of Registered Nursing is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morgan Malek