This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 08:02:58 (UTC).

Florence Cohen vs. Barbara Jill Pearson

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 Florence Cohen filed an Other lawsuit against Barbara Jill Pearson. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cohen, Florence

Respondent

Pearson, Barbara Jill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Roth, Thomas M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 11:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 08/13/2019 at 01:30:00 PM in 33 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 08/13/2019 at 01:30:00 PM in 33 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Granted) filed by Cohen, Florence on 07/09/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Amended (/Modified Temporary Restraining Order) filed by Cohen, Florence on 07/09/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 07/09/2019 at 01:30:00 PM in 33 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - rescheduled to 07/09/2019 at 01:30:00 PM in 33 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Proof of Service - PERSONAL (Order on Request to Continue Hearing (EA-116); Modified Temporary Restraining Order (EA-110)) filed by Cohen, Florence on 04/26/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2019
  • Order on Request to Continue Hearing (Granted) filed by Cohen, Florence on 04/23/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Proof of Service - PERSONAL (Notice of Court Hearing & EA-110 Temporary Restraining Order) filed by Cohen, Florence on 04/23/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Cohen, Florence on 04/17/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 04/23/2019 at 01:30:00 PM in 33 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Notice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Cohen, Florence on 04/11/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Temporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Granted) filed by Cohen, Florence on 04/11/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Ex Parte - scheduled for 04/11/2019 at 11:30:00 AM in 33 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Case assigned to Department 33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Cohen, Florence on 04/05/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders filed by Cohen, Florence on 04/05/2019. Filed By: Cohen, Florence(Petitioner) Refers To: Pearson, Barbara(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roth, Thomas M.