This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/03/2022 at 07:04:02 (UTC).

Fernando Zaragozacruz vs. Miguel Aguilar

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 Fernando Zaragozacruz filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Miguel Aguilar. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zaragozacruz, Fernando

Defendant

Aguilar, Miguel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAYLEY, GUY R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Non Service (Summons; Complaint) filed by Zaragozacruz, Fernando on 06/07/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketAffidavit of Unsuccessful Service (Summons; complaint) filed by Zaragozacruz, Fernando on 04/25/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAffidavit of Unsuccessful Service (Complaint; Summons) filed by Zaragozacruz, Fernando on 04/22/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Zaragozacruz, Fernando on 03/25/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Zaragozacruz, Fernando on 03/25/2022. Filed By: Zaragozacruz, Fernando(Plaintiff) Refers To: Aguilar, Miguel(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD