This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/06/2018 at 09:52:29 (UTC).

ESTATE OF CARMELIA HOLGUIN

Case Summary

On 08/04/2006 ESTATE OF CARMELIA HOLGUIN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0077

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ALCALA, PAUL

Fox, Frank O.

Decedent

HOLGUIN, CARMELIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

FOX, FRANK O.

Bagnall, Andrew C

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition To Confirm Sale Of Real Property (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition To Confirm Sale Of Real Property (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Confirmation of Sale of Real Property (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Confirmation of Sale of Real Property (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Confirmation of Sale of Real Property (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Confirmation of Sale of Real Property (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Confirmation of Sale of Real Property (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Confirmation of Sale of Real Property (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Final Distribution; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Confirmation of Sale of Real Property (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Confirmation of Sale of Real Property (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2006
  • 10/18/2006: Letters of Administration issued to PAUL ALCALA with FULL authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2006
  • 10/18/2006: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2006
  • 10/18/2006: Bond # 434325 by Surety AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY in the amount of $6000.00 posted by PAUL ALCALA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • 10/11/2006: Order for Probate filed; PAUL ALCALA appointed; Full Authority; Bond in the amount of $6000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • 09/13/2006: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH ATA Hearing: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2006
  • 08/25/2006: Affidavit of Publication filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2006
  • 08/17/2006: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2006
  • 08/04/2006: Uniform Civil Filing Fee Paid by PAUL ALCALA (Estate or trust under $250,000 - Probate) Receipt Number: 608040071 for $320.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2006
  • 08/04/2006: Petition for Probate of Will filed Filed By: ALCALA, PAUL(Petitioner) | HOLGUIN, CARMELIA(Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2006
  • 08/04/2006: Date of Death: 03/26/97

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAGNALL ANDREW C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOX FRANK OLIVER