This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 00:27:47 (UTC).

Ervin Johnson vs. Oxnard Automobile Exchange Inc

Case Summary

On 05/14/2013 Ervin Johnson filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Oxnard Automobile Exchange Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bustillos, Anthony

Johnson, Ervin

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Oxnard Automobile Exchange Inc

RCB Enterprises

Access Finance Inc

RCD Enterprises Inc. dba Automobile Exchange

American Finance & Associates Corp

RCD Enterprises Inc

Grandinetti, Robert

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

RCD Enterprises Inc. dba Automobile Exchange

American Finance & Associates Corp

Intervenor and Interested Party

Universal Underwriters Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Feingold, Erik B.

Johnson, Gregory L

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MARIAM, CRAIG J.

Quinn, Cecilia

Velasco, Gerald B

CAROBINI, DANIEL J.

Elder, William N. Jr

Intervenor and Interested Party Attorney

WOOD, CARY L

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 9:21 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 3:52 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion For Entry Of Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion For Entry Of Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:32 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request for Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 2:25 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to Intervene; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to Intervene; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
919 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2013
  • Case Management Statement filed by Bustillos, Anthony on 10/09/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • Stipulation and Order (to Continue Defendants Complaint Response Date to October 21, 2013) filed by RCB Enterprises on 08/19/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Stipulation and Order (to Continue Defendants Complaint Response Date to October 21, 2013 - forwarded to Judge Walsh) received from RCB Enterprises on 08/15/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • RCB Enterprises added as a Defendant effective 08/15/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Carlos Velez) filed by Bustillos, Anthony on 06/20/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by Bustillos, Anthony on 06/11/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 10/21/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bustillos, Anthony on 05/14/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • Complaint filed by Bustillos, Anthony on 05/14/2013. Filed By: Bustillos, Anthony(Plaintiff) Refers To: Oxnard Automobile Exchange Inc(Defendant) | RCB Enterprises(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less