This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:21:59 (UTC).

Emerging Technologies vs Surfside Industries

Case Summary

On 11/14/2016 Emerging Technologies filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Surfside Industries. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Emerging Technologies LLC

Sloatman, John K III

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Surfside Industries LLC

Jordan, Donna

Lopez, Charles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

ROMLEY, DAVID

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Slack, Chad M.

Morrow, Michael A

TENTLER, RICHARD W.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 2:27 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 2:27 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 9 day jury trial; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Description: Plaintiffs to Respond to and Produce Documents in Response to Defendant's Demand for Production of D...; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2016
  • Application - Other (and Declaration of Demurring Parties In Support of Automatic Extension CCP 430.41a2) filed by Surfside Industries LLC; Jordan, Donna on 12/23/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Answer filed by Lopez, Charles on 12/14/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Order of Reassignment heard 11/28/2016 02:27:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 11/21/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to 170.6 CCP (as to Judge Rocky Baio) filed by Emerging Technologies LLC; Sloatman, John K III on 11/21/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to 170.6 CCP (as to Judge Rocky Baio) filed by Emerging Technologies LLC; Sloatman, John K III on 11/21/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Emerging Technologies LLC; Sloatman, John K III on 11/14/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/14/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Complaint filed by Emerging Technologies LLC; Sloatman, John K III on 11/14/2016. Filed By: Emerging Technologies LLC(Plaintiff) | Sloatman, John K III(Plaintiff) Refers To: Surfside Industries LLC(Defendant) | Lopez, Charles(Defendant) | Jordan, Donna(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less