This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/12/2018 at 14:38:43 (UTC).

Elizabeth Toyer vs. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA

Case Summary

On 02/16/2011 Elizabeth Toyer filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Toyer, Elizabeth

Toyer, Jack

Defendants

JPMorgan Chase Bank NA for itself and as an acquirer of certain assets of Washington Mutual Bank fro

Quality Loan Servicing Corporation

Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation a US Government Corporation

JP Morgan Chase Bank NA

Quality Loan Service Corporation

Rasakhoo, Yasa

Washington Mutual Bank FA

JPMorgan Chase Bank NA for itself and as an acquirer of certain assets of Washington Mutual Bank from the FDIC acting as receiver

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Keep, Alfred R.

Paller, Bruce B

Defendant Attorneys

Vizzie, Rosario L

Scott, David C

Panossian, Natalie A

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S3; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S3; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S3; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: S3; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 10:22 AM; Department: 45; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 10:22 AM; Department: 45; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 45; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 45; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Amended Complaint; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Minutes

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 10:16 AM; Department: 45; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 45; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 45; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
179 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2011
  • Ex Parte Order (Granted re order to show cause re preliminary injunction) filed by Toyer, Elizabeth on 02/18/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • Ex Parte - for TRO and OSC Re Preliminary Injunction scheduled for 02/18/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in S3 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • Ex Parte Application - Other (for TRO and OSC Re Preliminary injunction) filed by Toyer, Elizabeth on 02/16/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • Notice of Lis Pendens filed by Toyer, Elizabeth on 02/16/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • Declaration - Other (of Bruce B Paller in supprot of Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC Re Prleiminary injunction) filed by Toyer, Elizabeth on 02/16/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • Declaration - Other (of Elizabeth Toyer in supprot of Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC Re Prleiminary injunction) filed by Toyer, Elizabeth on 02/16/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • Case assigned to Department S3.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Toyer, Elizabeth on 02/16/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Toyer, Elizabeth on 02/16/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • Complaint filed by Toyer, Elizabeth on 02/16/2011. Filed By: Toyer, Elizabeth(Plaintiff) Refers To: Washington Mutual Bank FA(Defendant) | JP Morgan Chase Bank NA(Defendant) | Quality Loan Servicing Corporation(Defendant) | Rasakhoo, Yasa(Defendant) | Quality Loan Service Corporation(Defendant) | JPMorgan Chase Bank NA for itself and as an acquirer of certain assets of Washington Mutual Bank from the FDIC acting as receiver(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Washington Mutual Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant