This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/11/2020 at 02:13:20 (UTC).

Elizabeth Dean vs. David Bell

Case Summary

On 03/19/2018 Elizabeth Dean filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against David Bell. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dean, Elizabeth

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Mofidi, Shohreh

Bell, David

Bell, Corey

Bell, Kevin

American Masonry & Contracting

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Bell, David

Bell, Kevin

American Masonry

Gerritsen, Jamie Ray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERRIZ, ARMANDO J

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Shaffer, Carmin K

BOOSER, MICHAEL C

Capra Cunningham, Marisa

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BOOSER, MICHAEL C

Capra Cunningham, Marisa

Wade, Edmond D

Hulick, Amy K.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer filed by Mofidi, Shohreh on 05/09/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Bell, David on 05/04/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketAnswer (and Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Bell, David on 05/04/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketBOOSER, MICHAEL C added as a effective 05/04/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Dean, Elizabeth on 04/17/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Momi Mofidi Occupant) filed by Dean, Elizabeth on 04/17/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/13/2018 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dean, Elizabeth on 03/19/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed by Dean, Elizabeth on 03/19/2018. Filed By: Dean, Elizabeth(Plaintiff) Refers To: Bell, Kevin(Defendant) | American Masonry & Contracting(Defendant) | Mofidi, Shohreh(Defendant) | Bell, David(Defendant) | Bell, Corey(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy K Hulick

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WADE EDMOND D. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAPRA-CUNNINGHAM MARISA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOOSER MICHAEL C. ESQ.