This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 17:35:36 (UTC).

EGC Financial Llc vs. Candice Yassini

Case Summary

On 12/10/2012 EGC Financial Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Candice Yassini. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

EGC Financial Llc

Chase Bank USA NA

Khakshooy & Associates PC

Law Offices of Sepehr Daghighian PC

Daghighian, Sepehr

Law Offices of Pedram Zivari

Zivari, Pedram

Miele, Kenneth J

Khakshooy, Arash A

Kenosian & Miele LLP

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Yassini, Candice

J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services Inc

JP Morgan Chase Bank

JPMorgan Chase & Co

JPMorgan Chase California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIELE, KENNETH J.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Sangary, Svitlana E

Cross Defendant Attorney

Daghighian, Sepehr

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 9:52 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 9:34 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
245 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2013
  • Motion to Strike - Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint scheduled for 03/08/2013 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Amount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 02/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Motion to Strike (Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) filed by Yassini, Candice on 02/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Demurrer (CLM) - to Plaintiffs Complaint scheduled for 03/08/2013 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Amount of 370.00 received for 172 - Answer or other 1st paper >$10K<=$25K on 02/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Demurrer (to Plaintiffs Complaint, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support Thereof) filed by Yassini, Candice on 02/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Jane Doe, co-resident) filed by EGC Financial Llc on 01/15/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by EGC Financial Llc on 12/10/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • Complaint filed by EGC Financial Llc on 12/10/2012. Filed By: EGC Financial Llc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Yassini, Candice(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less