This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 08:43:17 (UTC).

Edward Paul Temple vs. Bill Brown Enterprises Inc

Case Summary

On 01/17/2014 Edward Paul Temple filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Bill Brown Enterprises Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Temple, Edward Paul

Defendant

Bill Brown Enterprises Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Swaim, Bryan C.

Defendant Attorney

CORDES, JAMES H.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 2:39 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:52 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 11:25 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:15 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 2:39 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 2:52 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 11:25 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:00 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:15 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2014
  • Motion to Compel - responses to form interrogatories & request for production of docs & for sanctions scheduled for 07/01/2014 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • Amount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 06/05/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • Motion to Compel (responses to form interrogatories & request for production of docs & for sanctions) filed by Bill Brown Enterprises Inc on 06/05/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Answer filed by Bill Brown Enterprises Inc on 03/19/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Irene Berban, manager) filed by Temple, Edward Paul on 03/04/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 06/23/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Temple, Edward Paul on 01/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • Complaint filed by Temple, Edward Paul on 01/17/2014. Filed By: Temple, Edward Paul(Plaintiff) Refers To: Bill Brown Enterprises Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less