This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 07:52:13 (UTC).

Edith Arellano vs. Panamericana Insurance LLC

Case Summary

On 12/23/2013 Edith Arellano filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Panamericana Insurance LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Arellano, Edith

Emely Cortez Insurance Agency Corporation

Cortez Insurance Agency Inc

Quinones, Rosa

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Centravel Inc

Panamericana Insurance LLC

Torres, Marvin

Cypres, Gary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Osborne, Brian A.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

James, Johnnie A

Luna, David A

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Quash Subpoena (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel Production; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Quash Subpoena (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Bifurcation; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Bifurcation; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 9:49 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Continuance - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
344 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2014
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Panamericana Insurance LLC on 03/05/2014. Filed By: Panamericana Insurance LLC(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Arellano, Edith(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • Answer filed by Centravel Inc; Torres, Marvin; Panamericana Insurance LLC on 03/05/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (sub serve Jane Doe) filed by Arellano, Edith on 01/16/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (sub serve Jane Doe) filed by Arellano, Edith on 01/16/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (sub serve Jane Doe) filed by Arellano, Edith on 01/16/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/28/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Arellano, Edith on 12/23/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • Complaint filed by Arellano, Edith on 12/23/2013. Filed By: Arellano, Edith(Plaintiff) Refers To: Cypres, Gary(Defendant) | Panamericana Insurance LLC(Defendant) | Centravel Inc(Defendant) | Torres, Marvin(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less