This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 00:05:51 (UTC).

Duesenberg Invest Co vs Chaidez

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 Duesenberg Invest Co filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Chaidez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duesenberg Investment Company

Defendant

Chaidez, Rick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLS, DUSTIN

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Trial Setting Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:32 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Trial Setting Conference; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Trial Setting Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Trial Setting Conference; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference heard 07/21/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference - scheduled for 10/19/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Trial Setting Conference Statement) filed by Chaidez, Rick on 06/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Time: 2:32 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 06/21/2021 02:32:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference - scheduled for 07/21/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketMemorandum (That Civil Case is at Issue) filed by Duesenberg Investment Company on 05/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (Answer) filed by Chaidez, Rick on 03/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Chaidez, Rick on 03/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Duesenberg Investment Company on 01/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Duesenberg Investment Company on 01/15/2021. Filed By: Duesenberg Investment Company(Plaintiff) Refers To: Chaidez, Rick(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DUESENBERG INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLS DUSTIN