Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:14:54 (UTC).

Don Roberto Jewelers Inc vs. Gricelda Lopez

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Don Roberto Jewelers Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Gricelda Lopez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Don Roberto Jewelers Inc

Defendant

Lopez, Gricelda

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 45; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 45; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Judgment uncontested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • Judgment for Don Roberto Jewelers Inc against Lopez, Gricelda in the amount of: 1056.15 principal, punitive damages, 65.00 costs, pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees entered on 08/08/2014. None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 08/08/2014 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • The Court finds judgment on Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court FOR Don Roberto Jewelers Inc and AGAINST Gricelda Lopez in the amount of $1056.15 principal, $65.00 costs. Judgment Details: None. Sub Disposition type After Hearing - Judgment uncontested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal ($35.00) filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc on 07/03/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 08/08/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 45 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 48.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Fictitious Business Name Declaration filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Lopez, Gricelda(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less