Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:54 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Denise L Saunders

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Denise L Saunders. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Saunders, Denise L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Osterman, Peter R

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement; Description: Re: both parties; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2015
  • Minutes finalized for Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference heard 01/14/2015 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement - Re: both parties scheduled for 03/11/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - scheduled for 03/11/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - scheduled for 01/14/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • General Denial filed by Saunders, Denise L on 08/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Discover Bank on 07/31/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by Discover Bank on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Discover Bank(Plaintiff) Refers To: Saunders, Denise(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less