This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/18/2021 at 08:13:17 (UTC).

Diaz vs. County of Ventura

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 Diaz filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against County of Ventura. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diaz, Victoria

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Doe Foster Family Agency

County of Ventura

Stanley, Sima

Doe FFA Employees 1 though 10

Shields, Kevin Gordon

Doe CFS Placement Supervisor 1

Pugh, Gary

Pugh, Barbara

Doe CFS Placement Worker 1

Doe CFS ER Supervisor 1

Doe CFS Workers 1 through 10

Doe ER CFS Worker 1

Doe CFS ER Worker 2

CFS Worker Sima Stanley

Shields, Kevin

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

County of Ventura

Stanley, Sima

Pugh, Gary

Pugh, Barbara

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McMillan, Shawn A

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Anderson, Cathy

ASH, PAUL V

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Pugh, Gary; Pugh, Barbara on 10/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Anna Hall - Admin Assistant) filed by Diaz, Victoria on 09/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by County of Ventura; Stanley, Sima on 09/15/2021. Filed By: Stanley, Sima(Cross - Complainant) | County of Ventura(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Pugh, Gary(Cross - Defendant) | Pugh, Barbara(Cross - Defendant) | Shields, Kevin(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketShields, Kevin added as a Cross - Defendant effective 09/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by County of Ventura; Stanley, Sima on 09/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint submitted by County of Ventura; Stanley, Sima rejected on 09/15/2021. Filed By: County of Ventura(Cross - Defendant) | Stanley, Sima(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Diaz, Victoria on 08/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (GAL Robert Stanley) filed by Stanley, Sima on 07/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (Answer Package Upon Plaintiffs Counsel) filed by Pugh, Gary; Pugh, Barbara on 07/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 07/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to First Amended Complaint) filed by County of Ventura; Stanley, Sima on 07/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCFS Worker Sima Stanley added as a Defendant effective 06/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (First) filed by Diaz, Victoria on 06/14/2021. Filed By: Diaz, Victoria(Plaintiff) Refers To: Doe CFS Workers 1 through 10(Defendant) | Doe FFA Employees 1 though 10(Defendant) | Pugh, Gary(Defendant) | Pugh, Barbara(Defendant) | Shields, Kevin(Defendant) | Doe CFS Placement Supervisor 1(Defendant) | Doe CFS Placement Worker 1(Defendant) | Doe CFS ER Supervisor 1(Defendant) | Doe CFS ER Worker 2(Defendant) | Doe ER CFS Worker 1(Defendant) | CFS Worker Sima Stanley(Defendant) | County of Ventura(Defendant) | Doe Foster Family Agency(Defendant) | Stanley, Sima(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served upon Brenden Viahakis, Deputy Clerk of the Board) filed by Diaz, Victoria on 05/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Diaz, Victoria on 05/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served upon Rebecca Stanley, Co-Tenant on 5/18/21) filed by Diaz, Victoria on 05/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Diaz, Victoria on 05/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Diaz, Victoria on 04/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Diaz, Victoria on 04/19/2021. Filed By: Diaz, Victoria(Plaintiff) Refers To: Doe ER CFS Worker 1(Defendant) | Stanley, Sima(Defendant) | County of Ventura(Defendant) | Doe CFS ER Worker 2(Defendant) | Doe CFS ER Supervisor 1(Defendant) | Doe CFS Placement Worker 1(Defendant) | Doe CFS Placement Supervisor 1(Defendant) | Doe CFS Workers 1 through 10(Defendant) | Doe Foster Family Agency(Defendant) | Shields, Kevin(Defendant) | Doe FFA Employees 1 though 10(Defendant) | Pugh, Gary(Defendant) | Pugh, Barbara(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCMILLAN SHAWN A.